This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/24/2023 at 17:50:41 (UTC).

Matter of: 1994 BARBARA ANN ROYALTY REVOCABLE TRUST

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Matter of 1994 BARBARA ANN ROYALTY REVOCABLE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fenstermacher, Susanne M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0889

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fenstermacher, Susanne M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KEW, MICHELLE L.

Not Classified By Court

1994 BARBARA ANN ROYALTY REVOCABLE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAMAY, MICHAEL I

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: CONFIRMING TRUST ASSETS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition in Re:; Judicial Officer: Fenstermacher, Susanne M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONFIRM TRUST ASSETS Filed on 06/13/22 by Michelle Kew; Plaintiff/Petitioner; Parties Present; Plaintiff/Petitioner; Private Attorney: LAMAY, MICHAEL I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketLodge Order/Judgment; Comment: Proposed Order Confirming Trust Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re:; Comment: Petition to Confirm Trust Assets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketAssigned Probate Referee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketProbate Trust Petition Filed; Comment: In re:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less