Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:13:48 (UTC).

MATAMOROS VS CAMPOS

Case Summary

On 09/20/2016 MATAMOROS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CAMPOS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1006

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RANDY MATAMOROS

CAROLYN FERTADO

RICHARD LEE

Defendants

ALL OCCUPANTS

ANGEL CAMPOS

Brentwood, CA 94513

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLAUGHLIN, MARK A.

5109 Lone Tree Way Ste B

Antioch, CA 94531

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - CONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 11/10/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR COURT TRIAL FILED BY RANDY MATAMOROS, RICHARD LEE, CAROLYN FERTADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • COURT REPORTER NOT REQUESTED BY RANDY MATAMOROS, RICHARD LEE, CAROLYN FERTADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • UD TRIAL SET FOR 10/13/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2016 OF RANDY MATAMOROS AS TO DEFENDANT ANGEL CAMPOS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/22/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • ALL OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 09/22/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ANGEL CAMPOS (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ANGEL CAMPOS IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2016 OF RANDY MATAMOROS FILED BY ANGEL CAMPOS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 11/04/16 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/20/2016 OF RANDY MATAMOROS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLAUGHLIN, MARK A.