Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 20:29:08 (UTC).

MARK FISHER VS. CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 11/21/2012 MARK FISHER filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2626

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

MILABEL RULLAMAS

MARIA BAZINET

MANUEL SANCHEZ

MARIA MIU

JOSE HEREDIA

CENTEX REAL ESTATECORP.

MICHAEL REED

JENNIFER DELANO COHEN

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BARBOSA CABINETS, INC.

JOHNSON WOODWORK INC.

CREATIVE TOUCH INTERIORS, INC.

INSIGHT GLASS

SIGNAL HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING INC.

COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS

CENTEX REAL ESTATECORPORATION

T&C ROOFING, INC.

PEGGY S. LANE

CENTEX REAL ESTATECORP.

DELLINGER CONCRETE, INC.

EDGEWATER PLUMBINGOF BENICIA

WESTERN SHOWER DOOR, INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

T&C ROOFING, INC.

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GLASSMOYER, SCOTT W

1333 N. California Blvd. Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ADELMAN, FRED M

10250 Constellation Blvd Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FREEDMAN, KARREN L

215 Lennon Lane, Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

LOCKHART, ROBERT D.

1230 Oakmead Pkwy, Suite 306

Sunnyvale, CA 94085-4017

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

KIRVIN, TOM

71 Stevenson Street Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

GLASSMOYER, SCOTT W

1333 N. California Blvd. Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

MCELROY, JULIE D

2401 American River Drive Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

BRILLIANT, RACHEL K

275 Battery Street, Ste.850

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Other Attorneys

MAYFIELD, LORI R

505 - 14Th Street Suite 1210

Oakland, CA 94612

COLTON, BRIAN E

1655 Grant St, Ste 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

MORROW, WILLIAM D

535 Anton Blvd Suite 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

O'HARA, TERENCE J

255 W Julian St, Ste 402

San Jose, CA 95110

ARABI, ARASH S

21215 Burbank Blvd Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

DELOREY, CATHERINE W.

492 Ninth Street Suite 220

Oakland, CA 94607

SNODGRASS, JENNIFER L

2251 Harvard Street, Ste.100

Sacramento, CA 95815

O'BRIEN, JILLISA L

2603 Main Street, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614-6232

BUREK, LAWRENCE M

550 North Parkcenter Drive, Ste 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

DELASHAW, JOHNNY B.

18100 Von Karman Ave. Suite 750

Irvine, CA 92612

MACKEY, SCOTT M

2175 N. California Blvd #500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

AGUILERA, A ERIC

650 Town Center Drive Suite 100

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

7 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY CENTEX HOMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 15 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF FIRM NAME, ADDRESS AND ATTY FILED BY MARK FISHER, TAMARA FISHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAVELERS PROPERTYCASUALTY COMPANY OF; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO FURTHER CMC FILED BY CENTEX HOMES, CENTEX REAL ESTATECORP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • TOM KIRVIN CHANGES ATTORNEY FOR PEGGY S. LANE AND IS REPLACED BY DAVID W WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
482 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2012
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE LEGAL, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: MARK FISHER, TAMARA FISHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • MILABEL RULLAMAS, JUNE RULLAMAS, DANILO SALVADOR, GLORIA SALVADOR, MANUEL SANCHEZ, LETICIA SANCHEZ, ERIC THOMPSON, MELISSA THOMPSON, JON STYERS, PATRICIA RIBONI ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/07/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF MARK FISHER PAID BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF MARK FISHER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/05/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDGEWATER PLUMBINGOF BENICIA is a litigant

Latest cases where CREATIVE TOUCH INTERIORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where T & C ROOFING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTEX REAL ESTATE COMPANY, LLC is a litigant