This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/26/2020 at 12:06:01 (UTC).

MARIA DE JESUS VS ALBERTO PINERA

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MARIA DE JESUS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALBERTO PINERA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3227

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARIA DE JESUS PINERA

Antioch, CA 94509

Respondent

ALBERTO PINERA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2025
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 09/25/2020 OF MARIA DE JESUS PINERA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/24/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/24/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/27/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/24/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 9/24/25 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less