This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 15:34:04 (UTC).

LYCA K STUCKI VS DANIEL A STUCKI

Case Summary

On 02/02/2018 LYCA K STUCKI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DANIEL A STUCKI. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0610

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LYCA K STUCKI

Concord, CA 94518

Respondent

DANIEL A STUCKI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY DANIEL A STUCKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AS TO DANIEL A STUCKI FILED. DATE COPY MAILED BY CLERK TO RESPONDENT 03/26/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/02/2018 OF LYCA STUCKI AGAINST DANIEL A STUCKI BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO LYCA K STUCKI IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LYCA K STUCKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/03/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/01/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 02/02/2018 OF LYCA STUCKI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LYCA K STUCKI (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.