This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 11:30:38 (UTC).

LOVO VS. M&M BAKERY PRODUCTS

Case Summary

On 09/01/2016 LOVO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against M M BAKERY PRODUCTS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1685

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOSE LOVO

Defendant

M&M BAKERY PRODUCTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DARABI, ESQ., PARVIZ

500 Airport Blvd., Suite 150

Burlingame, CA 94010

Defendant Attorney

GUICHARD, MATTHEW P

101 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 112

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO CONTINUED CMC AND COMPLETION OF MEDIATION FILED BY M&M BAKERY PRODUCTSINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: PARVIZ DARABI CONSULTING SERVICES, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: JOSE LOVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF JURY FEE RECEIVED BY JOSE LOVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOSE LOVO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY M&M BAKERY PRODUCTSINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2016 OF JOSE LOVO FILED BY M&M BAKERY PRODUCTSINC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2016 OF JOSE LOVO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/19/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/07/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M&M BAKERY PRODUCTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GUICHARD, MATTHEW P.