Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/01/2017 at 21:41:52 (UTC).

LOUANNA SUTHERLAND VS. JESSE SUTHERLAND

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 LOUANNA SUTHERLAND filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against JESSE SUTHERLAND. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4249

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOUANNA SUTHERLAND

San Pablo, CA 94806

Respondent

JESSE SUTHERLAND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 21 TO 02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2014
  • 5CLDF4 CALENDARED ON 08/23/13 IN DEPT. 21. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/23/13 IN DEPT. 02.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR SP SPPRT, MEDICAL ( LOUANNA SUTHERLAND)(PRO PER); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY PERSONAL OF FL FORMS 100,110,320,123,150,155,320.520 ON MARK YEO FILED; SERVED ON 08/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • STIPULATION & ORDER RE PETITIONER SHALL NOT TAKE DEFAULT; MED PREMIUMS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2012
  • STIP/ORD SENT TO CLKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • HEARING ON MOTION/OSC WAS SET FOR 10/17/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON LEGAL SEPARATION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 08/23/2012 OF LOUANNA SUTHERLAND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK'S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/03/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK'S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT WAS SET FOR 8/23/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST FOR ORDERS RE: SP SPPRT, MEDICAL, FILED BY: LOUANNA SUTHERLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PETITION FOR LEGAL SEPARATION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less