This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 00:34:18 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0170

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA ZENAIDA VASQUEZ LOPEZ

Defendant

JANETTE HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POURSALIMI, PAYAM Y

8383 Wilshire Blvd Suite 830

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

DANESHRAD, ALAN D

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 830

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

TOSCHI, STEVEN C

5145 Johnson Drive

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 14 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • CLERKS TICKLER FOR DISMISSAL WAS SET FOR 3/27/19 AT 7:00 ON 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE TRIAL - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • CASE DISPOSITIONED - SETTLED CONDITIONALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/26/2017 OF MARIA VASQUEZ LOPEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/26/2017 OF MARIA VASQUEZ LOPEZ FILED BY JANETTE HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 4/24/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/26/2017 OF MARIA VASQUEZ LOPEZ AS TO JANETTE HERNANDEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/26/2017 OF MARIA VASQUEZ LOPEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/03/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/14/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.