This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 12:13:07 (UTC).

LOPEZ VS. FARMERS INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 LOPEZ filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against FARMERS INSURANCE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1843

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDDIE LOPEZ

ZIOMARA LOPEZ

EDDIE B LOPEZ

MASSIEL D LOPEZ

YOLANDA VELASQUEZ

Defendants

FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

FARMERS GROUP, INC

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERLEY, J EDWARD

1939 Harrison Street Suite 500

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON, VICTOR R

2050 Main Street, Suite 600

Irvine, CA 92614

SCHWEITZER, LORI A

1255 Powell St.

Emeryville, CA 94608

MAILE, CHRISTOPHER S.

15250 Ventura Blvd 9Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-3221

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2019
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • HEARING ON MINOR'S COMPROMISE; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF MASSIEL D LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR`S CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • PETITION TO COMPROMISE MINOR`S CLAIM FILED BY MASSIEL D LOPEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • A HEARING RE: MINOR'S COMPROMISE WAS SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/18 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 33 THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2015
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 10/13/2015 OF EDDIE LOPEZ AS TO MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 10/15/15 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 11/30/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/13/2015 OF EDDIE LOPEZ FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/01/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/17/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less