This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/13/2017 at 13:37:59 (UTC).

LINARES VS. ALDERWOOD INVESTORS

Case Summary

On 03/01/2012 LINARES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALDERWOOD INVESTORS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0041

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

VICTOR A. LINARES

Oakland, CA 94601

GLEDY LINARES

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Defendant and Counter Claimant

ALDERWOOD INVESTORS

141 Golf Club Rd Serving: Benito Sanchez

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2015
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 01/20/2012 OF VICTOR LINARES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • DEFTS EXHIBITS MAILED TO DEFT ALONG WITH JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/19/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM - $2,877.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2012
  • CLAIM OF DEFENDANT FILED BY ALDERWOOD INVESTORS (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • ORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO VICTOR A. LINARES IS GRANTED.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • ORDER ON FEE WAIVER AS TO VICTOR LINARES SUBMITTED TO PRO TEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY VICTOR A. LINARES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL HAS BEEN SET FOR 3/02/12 AT 9:30 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GLEDY LINARES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • ORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO GLEDY LINARES IS GRANTED.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $7,500.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM - $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less