This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 19:27:02 (UTC).

LEXINGTON INSURANCE VS ROEBBELEN CONST. MGNT

Case Summary

On 07/20/2010 LEXINGTON INSURANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROEBBELEN CONST MGNT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2167

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, GILBERT S

501 West Broadway Suite 1610

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2010 OF LEXINGTON INSURANCECOMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT SERVICES WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • STIPULATION & ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • TO 103- STIP TO CONT CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LEXINGTON INSURANCECOMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2010 OF LEXINGTON INSURANCECOMPANY RE: BUSINESS ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT SERVICES W/MAILING ON 08/04/10 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 10/14/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/20/2010 OF LEXINGTON INSURANCECOMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 12/15/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/23/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2010
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNANDEZ GILBERT SICRE