This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 09:03:29 (UTC).

LEUNG VS. BROWNING

Case Summary

On 08/31/2012 LEUNG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BROWNING. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0667

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMINIC LEUNG

Defendants

ANY AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Martinez, CA 94553

BENJAMIN M. BROWNING

Martinez, CA 94553

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JAMES R MORGAN

1511 Treat Blvd #600

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • REQ SENT TO COURT FINANCIAL SVCS W/COPY PLACED IN FILE - INTERPRET ATTACHED ORDER ON PAGE 3, LINE(S) 2 & 6 TO MEAN: DRAW A WARRANT IN THE SUM OF $1,800.00, PAYABLE TO JAMES R MORGAN AT ADDRESS: 1511 TREAT BLVD #600 WALNUT CREEK CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • NOTIFIED CCSO (MARGO) @ 10:30 RE DEF PD FOR STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • RECEIPT FOR RENT MONIES POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/31/2012 OF DOMINIC LEUNG, RENT MONIES POSTED BY BENJAMIN M. BROWNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/31/2012 OF DOMINIC LEUNG, RENT MONIES POSTED BY BENJAMIN M. BROWNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • RECEIPT FOR RENT MONIES POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DEFT NOTIFIED STAY OF EVICTION GRANTED WITH CONDITIONS, AND WHAT THE CONDITIONS ARE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON DEFENDANT BENJAMIN M. BROWNING FILED WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2012
  • ANY AND ALL OTHER UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • POSTING ORDER SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER CREIGHTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2012
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 10/17/12 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/31/2012 OF DOMINIC LEUNG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less