Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 21:40:36 (UTC).

LEONARD VS TRINITY PROTECTION

Case Summary

On 04/26/2012 LEONARD filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against TRINITY PROTECTION. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2963

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

ROBERT L LEONARD

Oakland, CA 94602

Respondent

TRINITY PROTECTIONSERVICES, INC.

Interested Party

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STAT OF CA

1515 Clay Street Suite 801

Oakland, CA 94612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

NADER, MICHAEL J.

1 Market Plaza Steuart Tower, Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94105

Interested Party Attorney

LABOR COMMISIONER,STATE OF CA

1515 Clay Street Suite 801

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2013
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR HEARING ORDER RENDERED ON 7/30/12 FILED BY ROBERT L LEONARD; Disposition: DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF RETURN EXPARTE LTR FROM DEFENSE COUNSEL DATED 2/25 SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2013
  • OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR OR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY TRINITY PROTECTIONSERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING DEFS MTN FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • HEARING ON MOTION WAS SET FOR 3/19/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • MOTION TO/FOR HEARING ORDER RENDERED ON 07/30/12 FILED BY ROBERT L LEONARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF EX PARTE RETURN LETTER SENT TO ALL ACTIVE AND DISPO`D PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • EX PARTE LETTER RTND TO PLTF - NO ACTION TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • CHECK FOR JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLTF OR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2012
  • COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/30/12 AT 9:06 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE /ADD ADDRESS OF PARTY TRINITY PROTECTIONSERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • DEFENDANT TRINITY PROTECTIONSERVICES, INC. ADDS ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • PLAINTIFF ROBERT L LEONARD ADDS ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • HEARING ON PETITION WAS SET FOR 6/19/12 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • LABOR COMMISSIONER,STAT OF CA ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL ON ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LABOR COMMISSIONER'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nader, Michael J