This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 01:05:56 (UTC).

KW KIRKER CREEK VS IRIQAT

Case Summary

On 12/23/2016 KW KIRKER CREEK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against IRIQAT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1355

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KW KIRKER CREEK LLC

Defendants

NAFETH IRIQAT

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIDLER,ESQ., GARY D.

Greene,Fidler & Chaplan, Llp 2719 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 200

Santa Monica, CA 90403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2017
  • OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION - UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DEC AND ORDER TO SUBMIT COPY OF LEASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - BEFORE TRIAL ON 03/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DECLARATION 585D CCP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • $ JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/23/2016 OF KW KIRKER CREEK LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT NAFETH IRIQAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/23/2016 OF KW KIRKER CREEK LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT NAFETH IRIQAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/23/2016 OF KW KIRKER CREEK LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/23/2016 OF KW KIRKER CREEK LLC AS TO DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • APPLICATION ON ORDER TO POST SUBMITTED TO LOWELL RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 2/06/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/23/2016 OF KW KIRKER CREEK LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLDENROD

    Read MoreRead Less