This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 13:45:16 (UTC).

KRISTEN STORY VS WARREN STORY

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 KRISTEN STORY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WARREN STORY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1263

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KRISTEN STORY

Respondent

WARREN STORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KAREN S. FENCHEL

1440 Maria Lane, Suite 100

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Respondent Attorney

SAHNAN, SILKY

654 3Rd Street

Brentwood, CA 94513

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY KRISTEN STORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY KRISTEN STORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • (F/L) PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL , W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF PETITION, SUMMONS, UCCJEA SIGNED BY WARREN STORY ON 04/14/17 AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF WARREN STORY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF RESPONSE; UCCJEA ON KAREN S FENCHEL ESQ FILED; SERVED ON 04/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/11/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/14/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/15/2017 OF KRISTEN STORY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/13/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/11/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/15/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less