This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/07/2016 at 18:54:18 (UTC).

KREISS VS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2010 KREISS filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, N A. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2084

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONALD T KREISS

El Sobrante, CA 94803

Defendants

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

JOSEPH DUNNEGAN MATHEWS

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. DBA BANKOF AMERICA

ROBERT LANE ELLIS

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.

DIABLO FUNDIG GROUP INC

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

ANTHONY ANGELO BATTAGELLO

Danville, CA 94526

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

LIFSON-LEU, AMY

101 Second St., Ste. 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3659

REIDY, DAVID S

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3659

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 31 TO 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED REGARDING ZACH B. REBER, PUTTING DONALD T KREISS IN PRO PER STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE ADDRESS OF PARTY DONALD T KREISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2011
  • SIGNED ORDER GRANTING ATTYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED TO RM103 FOR FILING (W/ COPIES & SASE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • NOTICE OF/TO ORDER OF DISMISSAL FILED ON BEHALF OF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP, BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY DONALD T KREISS; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., BAC HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: MC 051,052, 053 ON 3-21-11 SEE SVC LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • ORDER DISMISSING PLTFS COMPLAINT AS 4 DEFTS SENT TO ROOM 103 FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2011
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY DONALD T KREISS; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 9/17/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/13/2010 OF DONALD KREISS AS TO ANTHONY ANGELO BATTAGELLO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/22/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/17/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 12/07/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/13/2010 OF DONALD KREISS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • FIX CASE NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant