This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:31:35 (UTC).

KRAUSE VS FEDERAL SOLUTIONS GROUP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/31/2019 KRAUSE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FEDERAL SOLUTIONS GROUP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0688

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JAMES KRAUSE

MOBILE MINI

SELINA SINGH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CONTRA COSTA COUNTY,

ARGONAUT INSURANCECOMPANY,

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY,

FEDERAL SOLUTIONS GROUP,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SCULLY, TIMOTHY M

7801 Folsom Blvd. Suite 1101

Sacramento, CA 95826

TILLERY, STEPHEN

505 North 7Th Street Suite 360

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HUDSON, GEOFFREY R.

P.O. Box 2547

Napa, CA 94558

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JAMES KRAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: PLN CMC STATEMENT TO - SEE LIST ON 08/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • PLTFS REQ FOR AN EXTENSION TO FILE A REQ FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT & ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR PLTFS REQUEST (EX PARTE) FOR EXTENSION BY ONE LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO FILE JDMT MAILED ON 07-24-19 TO -SEE LIST-

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/31/2019 OF SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY, AS TO SELINA SINGH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • *DELETED*,LAW & MOTION HEARING WAS SET FOR 6/13/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • *DELETED*,HEARING SET FOR 6/13/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • *DELETED*,APPLICATION/MOTION TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VI CE FILED BY JAMES KRAUSE (ATTY: STEPHEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/11/2019 OF JAMES KRAUSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 8/28/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/17/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTRA COSTA COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where FEDERAL SOLUTIONS GROUP, INC. is a litigant