This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 01:08:33 (UTC).

KORY E. REGINATO VS MARK S. REGINATO

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 KORY E REGINATO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARK S REGINATO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1390

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KORY E REGINATO

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Respondent

MARK S REGINATO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • (F/L) PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL , W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS, PTN SIGNED BY MARK S REGINATO ON 04/08/18 AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/22/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/21/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/19/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/25/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/19/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/23/2018 OF KORY REGINATO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.