This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/27/2022 at 18:45:39 (UTC).

Kimberly Carlson vs. LIH Delta Pines Antioch LP

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 Kimberly Carlson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LIH Delta Pines Antioch LP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fannin, Jill C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1778

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fannin, Jill C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Carlson, Kimberly

Carlson, Brittney

Defendants and Respondents

LIH Delta Pines Antioch LP

Does 1-30

HILL, BRIANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WOLFF, ANDREW

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MINIOZA, JOSEPH J.

 

Court Documents

Initial Complaint Filed

08/24/2022: Initial Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Original Summons Issued/Filed

08/24/2022: Original Summons Issued/Filed

Order on Fee Waiver (Brittney Carlson)

08/24/2022: Order on Fee Waiver (Brittney Carlson)

Order on Fee Waiver (Kimberly Carlson)

08/24/2022: Order on Fee Waiver (Kimberly Carlson)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO NAME DOE 1

09/15/2022: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO NAME DOE 1

Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Kimberly

09/20/2022: Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Kimberly

Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Brittney

09/20/2022: Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Brittney

*Order on Additional Fee Waiver Granted

09/26/2022: *Order on Additional Fee Waiver Granted

*Order on Additional Fee Waiver Granted

09/26/2022: *Order on Additional Fee Waiver Granted

Answer to complaint

10/12/2022: Answer to complaint

CMC Notice - Fast Track

01/06/2023: CMC Notice - Fast Track

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Judicial Officer: Fannin, Jill C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer/Response/Denial - Unlimited; Answer to complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNotes; Comment: Answer e-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Order on Additional Fee Waiver Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Order on Additional Fee Waiver Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotes; Comment: signed waiver sent to 103

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLodge Order/Judgment; Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Brittney; Comment: Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Brittney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLodge Order/Judgment; Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Kimberly; Comment: Proposed Order on Additional Court Fee Waiver Carlson, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket*Request to Waive Additional Court Fees; Comment: *Request to Waive Additional Court Fees Carlson, Brittney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket*Request to Waive Additional Court Fees; Comment: *Request to Waive Additional Court Fees Carlson, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOE Amendment Filed; AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO NAME DOE 1; Comment: DOE 1 Brianne Hill

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Cause Of ActionComplaint; Type: Action; Description: Initial Complaint Filed 08/24/22; Remedy: Monetary Damages; Amount: $0.0; Remedy: Non-Monetary Damages; Amount: $0.0; Remedy: Punitive; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Complaint; File Date: 08/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Carlson, Kimberly, Carlson, Brittney; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Order on Fee Waiver Granted; Order on Fee Waiver (Kimberly Carlson); Comment: Kimberly Carlson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Order on Fee Waiver Granted; Order on Fee Waiver (Brittney Carlson); Comment: Brittney Carlson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued/Filed; Original Summons Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less