This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/30/2017 at 05:03:34 (UTC).

KIERAN DONNELLY VS ANTOINNETTE DEWBERRY

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 KIERAN DONNELLY filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against ANTOINNETTE DEWBERRY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5280

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KIERAN DONNELLY

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Respondent

ANTOINNETTE DEWBERRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN OF KIERAN DONNELLY AS TO ANTOINNETTE DEWBERRY (SERVED ON 04/21/17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM DWC TO LWC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • UPDATE 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN OF KIERAN DONNELLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • 1ST AMENDED DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN OF KIERAN DONNELLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • (F/L) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/10/2017 OF KIERAN DONNELLY AS TO ANTOINNETTE DEWBERRY (SERVED ON 11/10/15)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/27/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/31/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/27/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 10/28/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 1/28/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/10/2017 OF KIERAN DONNELLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less