This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 14:33:07 (UTC).

KEVIN KOLLO VS NICOLE NIXON

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 KEVIN KOLLO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NICOLE NIXON. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0488

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEVIN KOLLO

Bethel Island, CA 94511

Respondent

NICOLE NIXON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • --> CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM FL/MSD19-00488 TO FL/MSD18-00488.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 1/22/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/18/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 1/18/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/19/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/18/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/19/2018 OF KEVIN KOLLO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.