This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/01/2020 at 12:20:20 (UTC).

KEN MEHLER VS AMY MEHLER

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 KEN MEHLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AMY MEHLER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5663

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEN MEHLER

Half Moon Bay, CA 94019

Respondent

AMY MEHLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2024
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 12/30/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/28/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 12/30/24 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 12/31/2019 OF KEN MEHLER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • (F.L.) KEN MEHLER COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/30/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/29/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 25

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.