This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 12:06:37 (UTC).

KELLY A ROWLAND VS DONALD S ROWLAND

Case Summary

On 03/01/2017 KELLY A ROWLAND filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DONALD S ROWLAND. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0771

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KELLY A ROWLAND

Respondent

DONALD S ROWLAND

Alamo, CA 94507

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLLISS, MATTHEW S

1855 San Miguel Dr Ste 17

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • (F/L) PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL , W/NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF PETITION & SUMMONS, UCCJEA SIGNED BY DONALD S ROWLAND ON 02/22/17 AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM LWC TO DWC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • UPDATE DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/01/2017 OF KELLY ROWLAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • RESPONSE TO DISSO/NULLITY/LEGAL SEP OF DONALD S ROWLAND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 2/08/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/10/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/08/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 2/09/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/08/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/01/2017 OF KELLY ROWLAND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • PETITION FOR LEGAL SEPARATION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less