This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/01/2017 at 18:55:22 (UTC).

KATHERINE COMPAGNO VS. JOHN COMPAGNO

Case Summary

On 03/27/2014 KATHERINE COMPAGNO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHN COMPAGNO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1458

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KATHERINE COMPAGNO

Respondent

JOHN COMPAGNO

Not Classified By Court

M SUE TALIA

Danville, CA 94526

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BISCHOFF, LEANN G

1939 Harrison St., Suite 710

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent Attorney

TERENCE DANIEL DOYLE LAW OFFICE

571 Hartz Ave

Danville, CA 94526

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. LEANN G BISCHOFF SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR KATHERINE COMPAGNO AND IS REPLACED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • JUDGMENT ON RESERVED ISSUES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • F/L APPEARANCE, STIPULATION AND WAIVERS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • FAMILY LAW DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION (STATUS ONLY) FILED WITH EFFECTIVE DATE OF 123115

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR STATUS ONLY DISSOLUTION FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 3/27/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/23/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 3/26/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 6/25/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 9/23/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 03/27/2014 OF KATHERINE COMPAGNO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 38

    Read MoreRead Less