This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 11:47:30 (UTC).

KAPU VS GONZALEZ/GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2014 KAPU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GONZALEZ/GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0815

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAPU PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

ROSARIO BERNICE GONZALEZ

Richmond, CA 94801

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERMAN, PETER

634 Key Route Blvd

Albany, CA 94706

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2015
  • DocketREFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR RELEASE OF PAYMENT IN TRUSTED DATED 11/1/14 RESUBMITTED TO FINANCIAL SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketREFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • DocketREFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • DocketRETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • DocketLETTER RECEIVED FROM ATTORNEY PETER KERMAN RE: CLOSING OF LAW OFFICE/FORWARDING ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • Docket08 REPORT & REQ. FOR RELEASE OF PAYMENT IN TRUST FORWARDED TO FIN. SVCS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketCLERK REED NOTIFIED SHERIFF RE: RENT/ STAY MONIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2014 OF KAPU PROPERTIES, LLC, RENT MONIES POSTED BY ROSARIO BERNICE GONZALEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR RENT MONIES POSTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2014 OF KAPU PROPERTIES, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT ERICK GONZALEZ ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2014 OF KAPU PROPERTIES, LLC FILED BY ROSARIO BERNICE GONZALEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ROSARIO BERNICE GONZALEZ (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ROSARIO BERNICE GONZALEZ IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 9/26/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 08/12/2014 OF KAPU PROPERTIES, LLC FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less