This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 06:57:23 (UTC).

KAISER FOUND. HOSP. VS PORTER

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 KAISER FOUND HOSP filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against PORTER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1831

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL., THE PERMANENTE

YADIRA LIZETTE RODRIGUEZ

MARCALE PORTER

Respondent and Not Classified By Court

MARCALE PORTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

ANDRICH, VLADIMIR

516 16Th St

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER AFTER HEARING SENT TO MARCALE PORTER ON 10/20/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketHEARING ON PETITION/TRO RE: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE, FILED BY KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL., THE PERMANENTE; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketRESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE FILED; PROTECTED PERSON: YADIRA LIZETTE RODRIGUEZ / ORDER EXPIRES: 10/19/24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket5WVIOR CALENDARED ON 10/19/21 IN DEPT. RICH. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/19/21 IN DEPT. 03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(WORKPLACE VIOLENCE) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON WORKPLACE VIOLENCE PETITION FILED 09/28/2021 OF KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL., THE PERMANENTE AS TO MARCALE PORTER, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(WORKPLACE VIOLENCE) PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON WORKPLACE VIOLENCE PETITION FILED 09/28/2021 OF KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL., THE PERMANENTE AS TO MARCALE PORTER, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketHEARING ON PETITION/TRO RE: WORKPLACE VIOLENCE WAS SCHEDULED FOR 10/19/21 AT 8:30, IN DEPT. RICH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketWORKPLACE VIOLENCE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITAL., THE PERMANENTE, YADIRA LIZETTE RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketWORKPLACE VIOLENCE NOTICE OF COURT HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR WORKPLACE VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDERS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant