This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 18:55:08 (UTC).

KAHN VS. STEELE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2014 KAHN filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against STEELE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2161

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALAN KAHN

Defendants

CHRISTA STEELE

E MICHAEL DOWNER

DIANNE DAISS FELTON

DANIEL M DAISS

DOUGLAS DOWNER

DANIEL W ALBERT

PATRICIA COCHRAN

ADRIENNE CROWE

MEHERIAR HASAN

MARTIN B MCNAIR

J DAVID POWELL

JAMES P STAES

MARK F WILSON

MECHANICS BANK

FORD FINANCIAL FUND II, L.P.

EB ACQUISITION COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSS, TERRY

1 Sansome Street, Ste 3670

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorney

LOBDELL, JUDSON E

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMNT ENTERED ON 03/25/16 WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR 03/25/16 FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • PROPOSED ORDER RE FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: FINAL APPROVAL HEARING SET BY COURT; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALAN KAHN ISO MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2014
  • MOTION TO/FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY ALAN KAHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2014
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 11/24/2014 OF ALAN KAHN RE: BUSINESS MECHANICS BANK W/MAILING ON 11/26/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/24/2014 OF ALAN KAHN PAID BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/24/2014 OF ALAN KAHN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/26/15 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/08/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.