This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 12:04:00 (UTC).

KAHAN VS WINROW

Case Summary

On 12/03/2015 KAHAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WINROW. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1224

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

TOBIAS KAHAN

Appellants and Defendants

WAYNE WINROW

UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

DONALD MOREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

NAGY, EDWARD A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF UNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketUNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketFILE RETURNED FROM E.CHAMBERS IN MTZ TO K.CARDINALE IN RICHMOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ESTIMATED COST OF TX SENT TO WAYNE WINROW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketNOTIFICATION OF ESTIMATED COST OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT MAILED TO APPELLANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketORDER CONCERNING APPELLANTS PROPOSED STATEMENT ON APPEAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO WAYNE WINROW IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO DONALD MOREY IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCOURT TRIAL - U.D. WAS SET FOR 1/05/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY WAYNE WINROW (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO WAYNE WINROW IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF TOBIAS KAHAN FILED BY WAYNE WINROW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 1/19/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF TOBIAS KAHAN FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less