This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 12:16:57 (UTC).

KAHAN VS MOREY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2016 KAHAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MOREY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1225

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

TOBIAS KAHAN

Appellants and Defendants

WAYNE WINROW

UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

DONALD MOREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

NAGY, EDWARD A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: UNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL TO WAYNE WINROW NO SUCH NUMBER UNABLE TO FORWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: UNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL TO DONALD MOREY RETURN TO SENDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF UNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketUNREPORTED MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketFILE RETURNED FROM E.CHAMBERS IN MTZ TO K.CARDINALE IN RICHMOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ESTIMATED COST OF TX MAILED TO DONALD MOREY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DocketNOTIFICATION OF ESTIMATED COST OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT MAILED TO APPELLANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL WITH CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketRETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO DONALD MOREY IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO WAYNE WINROW IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF TOBIAS KAHAN FILED BY WAYNE WINROW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketPRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY WAYNE WINROW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DONALD MOREY (CONFIDENTIAL)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO DONALD MOREY IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 1/19/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/03/2015 OF TOBIAS KAHAN FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less