Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 20:16:57 (UTC).

JOSE MERCADO VS. E I J CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 11/20/2012 JOSE MERCADO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against E I J CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2623

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANCISCO FLORES

JOSE MERCADO

JOSE ECHEVERRIA

Defendants

DIONICIO RAFAEL RODRIGUEZ

E I J CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALINAS, ROBERT

428 13Th St 8Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2015
  • CHECK FOR RECEIPT OF DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • HEARING ON STATUS REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2014
  • 5BKHC4 CALENDARED ON 07/21/15 IN DEPT. 31. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 07/21/15 IN DEPT. 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 31 TO 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR STATUS REVIEW RE BANKRUPTCY ON 9/3/14; Disposition: DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • HEARING ON STATUS REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY JOSE MERCADO, FRANCISCO FLORES, JOSE ECHEVERRIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • HEARING ON STATUS REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • HEARING ON STATUS REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2013
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED. BANKRUPTCY COURT CASE NUMBER 13-40438

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2012
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: SUNDEEN, SALINAS & PYLE, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: JOSE MERCADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 1/25/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/23/13 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/20/2012 OF JOSE MERCADO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALINAS, ROBERT