This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 15:29:49 (UTC).

JOSE MEDINA VS VERONICA M. MEDINA

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 JOSE MEDINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VERONICA M MEDINA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0585

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSE LUIS MEDINA

Berkeley, CA 94710

Respondent

VERONICA MERCEDES MEDINA

San Leandro, CA 94577

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 041118 HEARING RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT WITH ATTACHED DISSOMASTER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT ( VERONICA MERCEDES MEDINA)(PRO PER); Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY JOSE LUIS MEDINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: SERVICE OF PRELIMINARY DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED BY JOSE LUIS MEDINA

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/29/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 1/30/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/30/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • --RELATED CASE NUMBER IS: D17-05221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/30/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 01/29/2018 OF JOSE MEDINA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.