This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 15:15:15 (UTC).

JONES VS. KALINOWSKI

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 JONES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KALINOWSKI. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2272

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERICKA JONES

Defendant

STANLEY EUGENE KALINOWSKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILLIN, ANDREW G

2 Theater Square Suite 230

Orinda, CA 94563

Defendant Attorney

BARELLA, LOUIS R

601 California Street Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • CHECK FOR MEDIATION COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 34 TO 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • 5CLKC5 CALENDARED ON 10/16/17 IN DEPT. 34. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/16/17 IN DEPT. 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • 5FCMC5 CALENDARED ON 10/18/17 IN DEPT. 34. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 10/18/17 IN DEPT. 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY STANLEY EUGENE KALINOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ERICKA JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY STANLEY EUGENE KALINOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/01/2016 OF ERICKA JONES FILED BY STANLEY EUGENE KALINOWSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE LEGAL LLC, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: ERICKA JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/01/2016 OF ERICKA JONES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFF ERICKA JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/19/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/06/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.