Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 11:36:25 (UTC).

JOHNSON VS MONCADA

Case Summary

On 05/25/2012 JOHNSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MONCADA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0143

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

JENNIFER B. JOHNSON

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Appellant

ISABEL MONCADA

Angels Camp, CA 95222

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2012
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/05/2012 OF JENNIFER JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2012
  • CHECK FOR ANSWER TO REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • CLERK'S TICKLER SET FOR 7/05/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 1CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT FILED BY ISABEL MONCADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF REQUEST TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT AND ANSWER SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • HEARING ON APPEAL OF SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL DE NOVO WAS SET FOR 7/13/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. SCA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FROM THE JUDGMENT FILED BY CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/05/2012 OF JENNIFER JOHNSON ISABEL MONCADA

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 03/05/2012 OF JENNIFER JOHNSON AS TO DEFENDANT ISABEL MONCADA FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 03/13/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • OLGA ISABEL MONCADA ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 4/16/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $2,967.00

    Read MoreRead Less