This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 17:29:30 (UTC).

JOHN SU VS DARREN K PROUIX

Case Summary

On 09/12/2014 JOHN SU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DARREN K PROUIX. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1621

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN SU

Albany, CA 94706

Defendants

DARREN K PROULX

LAND RESOURCE INVESTMENTS, INC

LAND RESOURCE CONCEPTS INC

LAND RESOURCE MANAGEMENT INC

CALIFORNIA LAND RESOURCES II ASSOCIATION

CAL LAND RESOURCES009 ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES027 ASSOCIATION, INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES, 008 ASSOCIATION, INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES033 ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES034 ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES073 ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES1011 ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES1718 ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCES1920 ASSOCIATION

CAL LAND RESOURCESIII ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCESIV ASSOCIATION

CAL LAND RESOURCESIV, ASSOCIATION INC

CAL LAND RESOURCESIX ASSOCIATION, INC

CAL LAND RESOURCESV ASSOCIATION INC

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KOENIG, ROBERT A

20651 Golden Springs Dr #240

Diamond Bar, CA 91789

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • CHECK FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • CHECK FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • CHECK FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DEFAULT ORDERED ENTERED IN OPEN COURT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2014 OF JOHN SU AGAINST DEFENDANT DARREN K PROULX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY DEFTS ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN & DEFAULT ENTERED FOR COUNSELS FAILURE TO APPEAR; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY DEFTS ANSWER SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN & DEFAULT ENTERED FOR COUNSELS FAILURE TO APPEAR; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: ANOTHER ADDRESS FOUND FOR ATTY. KOENIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • ORDER FOR SANCTIONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF COPY OF ORDER FOR SANCTIONS SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2014 OF JOHN SU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/27/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/12/2014 OF JOHN SU FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/14/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY JOHN SU (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.