This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/19/2017 at 22:57:55 (UTC).

JOHN P ASHER VS. HOME FOR JEWISH PARENTS

Case Summary

On 07/14/2015 JOHN P ASHER filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HOME FOR JEWISH PARENTS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1243

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN P ASHER

CHARLES HOFF

EVELYN ASHER

ROBIN ASHER

EILEEN HOFF

Defendants

HOME FOR JEWISH PARENTS

THE REUTLINGER COMMUNITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLAINE, CARL P

10640 Mather Blvd #200

Mather, CA 95655

Defendant Attorney

LYNCH, ROBERT T.

170 Columbus Ave. 5Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94133

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN P ASHER, CHARLES HOFF, EVELYN ASHER, ROBIN ASHER, EILEEN HOFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE REUTLINGER COMMUNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN P ASHER, CHARLES HOFF, EVELYN ASHER, ROBIN ASHER, EILEEN HOFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY THE REUTLINGER COMMUNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN P ASHER, CHARLES HOFF, EVELYN ASHER, ROBIN ASHER, EILEEN HOFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2015
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/14/2015 OF JOHN ASHER FILED BY THE REUTLINGER COMMUNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE NAME OF PARTY THE REUTLINGER COMMUNITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 12/01/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 9/18/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DECLARATION OF CHARLES Y HOFF FILED RE: PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 377.32 & W & I 15657.3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/14/2015 OF JOHN ASHER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYNCH, ROBERT THOMAS