Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/01/2017 at 21:36:08 (UTC).

JOHN O'DONNELL VS. JEAN REID-O'DONNELL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 JOHN O'DONNELL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JEAN REID-O'DONNELL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4239

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHN F. O'DONNELL

Hooper, UT 84315

Respondent

JEAN REID-O'DONNELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2013
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 37 TO 15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2012
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • (F/L) PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 08/23/2012 OF JOHN O'DONNELL AS TO JEAN REID-O'DONNELL WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 09/17/12 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 08/23/2012 OF JOHN O'DONNELL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK'S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/03/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK'S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR DISPO/JUDGMENT WAS SET FOR 8/23/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 37

    Read MoreRead Less