Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 23:15:11 (UTC).

JOELENE D'ALOISIO VS. MARINER HEALTH CARE

Case Summary

On 04/27/2012 JOELENE D'ALOISIO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARINER HEALTH CARE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1023

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOELENE D'ALOISIO

LEONE STOODLEY

Defendants

CREEKSIDE HEALTH CARE CENTER

MARINER HEALTH CARE MANAGEMENTCOMPANY

JANET ROTICH

MARINER HEALTH CENTRAL INC

MARINER HEALTH CARE INC

MHC WEST HOLDING COMPANY

GRANCARE LLC

JULIO MESTRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAWAMOTO, GEORGE

870 Market St Suite 212

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

GIOVANNIELLO, ALEXANDER F

1 Pointe Drive Suite 300

Brea, CA 92821

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO FIRST, SECOND, THIRD AND FOURTH CAUSE(S) OF ACTION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2013
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED BY GRANCARE LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES FILED BY JANET ROTICH; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR ADJUDICASTION OF ISSUES FILED BY MHC WEST HOLDING COMPANY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 6/18/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2012
  • NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/11/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/27/2012 OF JOELENE D'ALOISIO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/31/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MHC WEST HOLDING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MARINER HEALTH CENTRAL, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANCARE, LLC is a litigant