This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:52:54 (UTC).

JOANNE NEAL VS DALE M. NEAL

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 JOANNE NEAL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DALE M NEAL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1765

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOANNE NEAL

Huntersville, NC 28078

Respondent

DALE M NEAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

KOCK, ARLENE D

2500 Old Crow Canyon Rd.Ste214

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ALAMEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,090.79

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 08/15/18 HEARING RE: SPOUSAL SUPPORT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • WAGE & EARNINGS ASSIGNMENT ORDER FILED BY JOANNE NEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • FEE COLLECTED FOR SALE OF SMALL PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 7/10/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/10/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 4/11/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 10/09/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 4/11/22 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 04/10/2017 OF JOANNE NEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less