This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 08:01:12 (UTC).

JKL CORP VS TULLIS

Case Summary

On 01/13/2012 JKL CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TULLIS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0033

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JKL CORPORATION

Defendant

MARTIN R TULLIS JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

4261 Norwalk Drive #107

San Jose, CA 95129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2012
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED S-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/13/2012 OF JKL CORPORATION AS TO DEF ENDANT MARTIN R TULLIS JR WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/14/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/13/2012 OF JKL CORPORATION FILED AS TO DEFENDANT MARTIN R TULLIS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/13/2012 OF JKL CORPORATION AGAINST DEFENDANT MARTIN R TULLIS JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/13/2012 OF JKL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 01/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 2/29/12 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 01/13/2012 OF JKL CORPORATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.