This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/13/2017 at 18:38:28 (UTC).

JIMENEZ VS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 11/09/2012 JIMENEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOMEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0660

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATALIA JIMENEZ

Concord, CA 94520

Defendant

MANUEL GOMEZ

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2013
  • **PROOF OF SERVICE RECEIVED NOT FILED-FORM NOT COM PLETE WITH NAME OF PERSON SERVED, ADDRESS & DATE*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL: ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE COURT TRIAL AS TO MANUEL GOMEZ-NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED UT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY MANUEL GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • GAVE PLT @ COUNTER PAPERWK W/NEW DATE & LOCATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • CLERKS`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • PARTY INFORMATION UPDATED FOR MANUEL GOMEZ CHANGING DEFS ADDRESS PER PLTS CALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 12/31/12 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM - $2,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less