Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/23/2017 at 19:20:57 (UTC).

JENSEN HOME, INC VS CONTRERAS

Case Summary

On 07/06/2012 JENSEN HOME, INC filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against CONTRERAS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1073

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

RICHARDO CONTRERAS

Hayward, CA 94544

Respondent

LABOR COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Stockton, CA 95202

Plaintiff / Appellant

JENSEN HOME, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

MINAMIZO, SUSAN S

225 Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 09 TO 17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • COURT TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 1 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • ORDER TO WITHDRAW APPEAL, W/OUT PREJUDICE BY JENSEN HOME, INC., RETURN BOND OF $28,690.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/09/12 AT 9:05 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DEFENDANT LABOR COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA ADDS ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2012
  • DEFENDANT RICHARDO CONTRERAS ADDS ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 8/06/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • UNDERTAKING POSTED BY SURETY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY IN THE AMOUNT OF $28,656.01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • VERIFICATION IN SUPPORT OF JENSEN HOME, INC.S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL ON ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less