Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 10:04:39 (UTC).

JELVEH VS WELLS FARGO

Case Summary

On 12/14/2012 JELVEH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WELLS FARGO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2919

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PERUZ JELVEH

JOSETTE M JELVEH

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC

DETSCHE BANKNATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

GOLDMAN SACHS REALESTATE FUNDING CORP

GSR MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2007-AR2

AYAYO LAW OFFICES

CHRISTOPHER P AYAYO

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHEG, NATHAN L

6200 Stoneridge Mall Road Suite 300

Pleasanton, CA 94588

HARRIS JR, HAIG A

220 Montgomery Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant Attorneys

BUELL, EDWARD R

1 Embarcadero Ctr 26Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

LE, MICHAEL M

301 E Ocean Drive Suite 1720

Long Beach, CA 90802

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON/FOR COMPLAINT FILED WITH PROOF OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; PROPOSED JUDGMENT/STIP ON N L SCHEG, ESQ FILED; SERVED ON 07/16/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF/TO WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED BY PERUZ JELVEH, JOSETTE M JELVEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2014
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PERUZ JELVEH FILED BY NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED CMP FILED BY NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PERUZ JELVEH FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS ON 12-17-12 SEE SVC LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2013
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/02/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/19/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 06

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NBS Default Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LE MICHAEL M. ESQ