This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/15/2017 at 15:08:46 (UTC).

JAMES JUTSON VS. ADVANTAGE BATTERY

Case Summary

On 10/09/2014 JAMES JUTSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADVANTAGE BATTERY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2231

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES JUTSON

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ADVANTAGE BATTERY

CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD OF CALIFORNIA, INC

GUARDIAN SECURITY AGENCY

GRUPO IMSA

MSC PINOLE POINT STEELE INC

ADVANTAGE BATTERY CORPORATION,INC.

ADVANTAGE BATTERY CORPORATION,INC

ROES 1-20

CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD OF CALIFORNIA INC

Intervenor

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCECORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PINELLI, ANTHONY F

110 North Third Street

San Jose, CA 95112

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN, ROBERT J

121 Spear Street Suite 410, Two Rincon Center

San Francisco, CA 94105

ARAKAWA, GREGORY P

1401 Willow Pass Road Suite 700

Concord, CA 94520-7982

SEITZ, FRIEDRICH W.

801 South Grand Ave 9Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Intervenor Attorney

SOLEIMANPOUR, MATTHEW

3870 Murphy Canyon Road Suite 320

San Diego, CA 92123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2015
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO THE COMPLAINT OF JUTSON AS TO CUSHMAN & WAKEFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELDOF CALIFORNIA, INC; Disposition: ADVANCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF JAMES JUTSON AS TO DEFENDANT ADVANTAGE BATTERY CORPORATION,INC. WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY ADVANTAGE BATTERY CORPORATION,INC.; Disposition: ADVANCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT OF ADVANTAGE BATTERY CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/15/2014 OF CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELDOF CALIFORNIA, INC AS TO DEFENDANT ADVANTAGE BATTERY CORPORATION,INC., GUARDIAN SECURITY AGENCY, GRUPO IMSA, MSC PINOLE POINT STEELE INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF JAMES JUTSON AS TO DEFENDANT GUARDIAN SECURITY AGENCY WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JAMES JUTSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 3/13/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2013
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/24/2013 OF JAMES JUTSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 3/13/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 12/30/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2013
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.