This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 21:33:01 (UTC).

JAMES HEWATT INC VS SAG ASSOCIATES/EBRPD

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 JAMES HEWATT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SAG ASSOCIATES/EBRPD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Shoker, Palvir. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0092

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

Shoker, Palvir

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JAMES HEWATT, INC

Defendants and Respondents

SAGE ASSOCIATES INC AGENT FOR SERVICE: ALLEN A AH YOU

EAST BAY REGIONAL PARKS DISTRICT ATTN: ANNE KASSEBAUM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Certified Mail

03/28/2022: Proof of Service by Certified Mail

Miscellaneous Filing Re:

04/20/2022: Miscellaneous Filing Re:

Minutes w/Appearances

05/13/2022: Minutes w/Appearances

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial; Minutes w/Appearances; Judicial Officer: Shoker, Palvir; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present; Defendant/Respondent: SAGE ASSOCIATES INC AGENT FOR SERVICE: ALLEN A AH YOU

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing Re:; Comment: LETTER FROM DEFT SAGE PLACED IN FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Certified Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Cause Of ActionPlaintiff's Claim; Type: Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Plaintiff's Claim; File Date: 03/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketPapers Mailed to Submitting Party; Comment: PAPERS MAILED TO SUBMITTING PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • Docket*; Comment: REQUEST FOR CERT MAIL TO EACH DEFT FILED %%X%%

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketHearing set for:; Comment: A Small Claims Court Trial was set for 5/13/22 at 9:15 in Dept. 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketService by Clerk by Certified Mail to Each Defendant; Comment: COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON Complaint/Petition SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: 0002-0003 220322-0003-CK SCM/ 30.00 Paymt Operator Code: LOLSE *FEE: 220322-0003-CK SCM/ 30.00 Paymt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant Filed; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00) 220322-0002-CK SM2/ 50.00 Paymt Operator Code: LOLSE *FEE: 220322-0002-CK SM2/ 50.00 Paymt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAmount of Claim; Comment: AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $3,400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less