Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 21:29:26 (UTC).

ISMAEL RUIZ GARCIA, LABOR COMMISSIONEROF THE STATE OF CALIFORN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2012 ISMAEL RUIZ GARCIA, LABOR COMMISSIONEROF THE STATE OF CALIFORN was filed as a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2928

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ISMAEL RUIZ GARCIA

Defendant

ARDALAN A SHOKRI

Assignee

LABOR COMMISSIONEROF THE STATE OF CALIFORN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LABOR COMMISIONER,STATE OF CA

1515 Clay Street Suite 801

Oakland, CA 94612

Assignee Attorney

BERRY, JAMES E

Civ. Of Labor Standards Enf. 2031 Howe Avenue, Ste 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $304.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DATE MAILED: 12/12/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED RE: IN SUPP OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,287.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,844.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7,056.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $882.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • DATE MAILED: 10/01/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • ** VOID ** GC 70626(A) ISSUANCE OF ABSTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/24/2012 OF ISMAEL GARCIA FILED; ASSIGNED TO LABOR COMMISSIONEROF THE STATEOF CALIFORN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 04/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT AND JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2012
  • COPY OF ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIR/DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS - JAMES E. BERRY