Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/08/2016 at 11:23:07 (UTC).

IRENE ANN EGERMAN VS. HUGH GEE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2010 IRENE ANN EGERMAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against HUGH GEE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2831

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IRENE ANN EGERMAN

Defendants

HUGH GEE, CSA

QUEST SECURITIES, INC.

OM FINANCIAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

LINCOLN BENEFIT LIFE INSURANCECOMPANY

BUFFETT, GEE & TEMPLETON INS. SERVICES, INC

HUGH GEE & COMPANY, INC.

TERRENCE H. GEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER, RICHARD S

1600 South Main Street Suite 230

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

GAMBOA, RENE I

One Sansome Street Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

REIF, BRANDON S

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 450

Los Angeles, CA 90067

ROSEN, MARTIN E

633 West Fifth St. 47Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

ROMO, JR, PETER E

560 Mission Street 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL OF CASE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HUGH GEE, CSA, BUFFETT, GEE & TEMPLETON INS. SERVICES, INC, HUGH GEE & COMPANY,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2011
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF IRENE EGERMAN AS TO DEFENDANT OM FINANCIAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2010
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR SUMMONS FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • PETITION/DECLARATION TO APPOINT A GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR IRENE ANN EGERMAN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • ORDER APPOINTING BONITA J. BURNSON GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR IRENE ANN EGERMAN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED 09/24/2010 OF IRENE EGERMAN AS TO PLAINTIFF IRENE ANN EGERMAN, BONITA J. BURNSON ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2010
  • SIGNED APP & ORDER FOR APPT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM S ENT TO ROOM 103 FOR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/08/10 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/23/10 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS NOT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lincoln Benefit Life Company is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY & GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER, RICHARD S.