This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/12/2017 at 11:50:49 (UTC).

IH5 PROPERTY WEST VS THOMAS/MORGAN

Case Summary

On 03/02/2017 IH5 PROPERTY WEST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against THOMAS/MORGAN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0246

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IH5 PROPERTY WEST,L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED

Defendants

LISA DENISE THOMAS

Antioch, CA 94509

DAMESHIA ROJEAN MORGAN

Antioch, CA 94509

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN

2300 Clayton Road Suite 1350

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING DATE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ** VOID ** GC70617(A) MTN/APPL OR OTHER DOC RQG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER DATE WAS SET FOR 6/30/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • ORDER TO/FOR GRANTING STIPULATED JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR JUDGES SIGNATURE FROM IH5 PROPERTY WEST,L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR DECLARATION OF NON-COMLIANCE FILED BY IH5 PROPERTY WEST,L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR JUDGES APPROVAL ON STIPULATION FROM IH5 PROPERTY WEST,L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: PLNTFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • A LAW & MOTION HEARING WAS SET FOR 3/16/17 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DEMURRER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2017 OF IH5 PROPERTY WEST,L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED FILED BY LISA DENISE THOMAS, DAMESHIA ROJEAN MORGAN, REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LISA DENISE THOMAS, DAMESHIA ROJEAN MORGAN (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO LISA DENISE THOMAS, DAMESHIA ROJEAN MORGAN IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER OVER 45 DAYS WAS SET FOR 4/17/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. 4CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/02/2017 OF IH5 PROPERTY WEST,L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.