This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 04:39:23 (UTC).

HUNT VS BENZLER

Case Summary

On 02/28/2012 HUNT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BENZLER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0121

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JENNIFER ANN HUNT

Danville, CA 94526

JOHN M HUNT III

Danville, CA 94526

Defendant

SYLVIA BENZLER

Alamo, CA 94507

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2016
  • CERTIFIED COPY/COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILE D BY SYLVIA BENZLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • EXHIBITS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO CCP 1952-1952.3 AFTER PROPER NOTICE TO THE PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 04/12/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 04/12/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 04/02/12 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/03/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2012
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/28/2012 OF JENNIFER HUNT AS TO SYLVIA BENZLER FILED. DATE OF MAILING 03/14/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 4/02/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $4,083.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less