This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 00:41:08 (UTC).

HUANG VS. DAVIS

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 HUANG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1029

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANG HUANG

Defendant

ANTOINETTE DAVIS

Rodeo, CA 94572

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLACK, JONATHAN

2001 Omega Rd. Ste. 203

San Ramon, CA 94583

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2017
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE GIVEN VIA TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • ORDER DENYING STAY OF EXECUTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • PETITION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY ANTOINETTE DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - UNCONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 02/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO DISPOSITION U.D.CASEWITHIN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - U.D. WAS SET FOR 2/09/17 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ANTOINETTE DAVIS (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO ANTOINETTE DAVIS IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/01/2016 OF KANG HUANG FILED BY ANTOINETTE DAVIS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 1/17/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/01/2016 OF KANG HUANG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less