This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 09:39:48 (UTC).

HOUSING AUTHORITY VS HAZELWOOD

Case Summary

On 06/09/2017 HOUSING AUTHORITY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HAZELWOOD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0379

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSING AUTHORITY OF CONTRA COSTA COUNTY

Defendant

LEOSHA HAZELWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, SHARON L

651 Pine Street, 9Th Floor

Martinez, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2017
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - BEFORE TRIAL ON 07/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF STEFANIE MONGE FILED RE: SUPPORT OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/09/2017 OF HOUSING AUTHORITY OF CONTRA COSTA COUNTY FILED AS TO DEFENDANT LEOSHA HAZELWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/09/2017 OF HOUSING AUTHORITY OF CONTRA COSTA COUNTY AGAINST DEFENDANT LEOSHA HAZELWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON DEFENDANT LEOSHA HAZELWOOD FILED WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL: NTC OF FILING UD TO L. HAZELWOOD ***NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FWD***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • RETURNED MAIL: NTC OF FILING UD TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS ***NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FWD***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • ** VOID ** REQ FOR ORD TO PUBL/POST SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 7/25/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 06/09/2017 OF HOUSING AUTHORITY OF CONTRA COSTA COUNTY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS LAVENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less